EP0696197 - ANALGESIC ANAESTHETIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF ABERDEEN Research and Innovation University Office Kings College Aberdeen AB24 3FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states University of Aberdeen Research and Innovation University Office Kings College Aberdeen AB24 3FX / GB | ||
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF ABERDEEN Auris Business Centre, 23 St. Machar Drive Aberdeen AB2 1RY, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, John Alexander Strachan 38 Forbesfield Road Aberdeen AB1 6PA / GB | 02 /
TUNSTALL, Michael Eric 9 South Headlands Crescent, Newtonhill Stonehaven, Kincardineshire AB3 2PT / GB | 03 /
RODGERS, Robert Colin Whitegate, Broadwath Heads Nook, Carlisle, Cumbria CA4 9BA / GB | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al Ablett & Stebbing 45 Lancaster Mews Lancaster Gate London W2 3QQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/23] | Scott, Susan Margaret British Technology Group Ltd. 101, Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1996/07] | Percy, Richard Keith Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94912657.7 | 21.04.1994 | [1996/07] | WO1994GB00839 | Priority number, date | GB19930008306 | 22.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9308306 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423727 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696197 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696197 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61M16/18, // (A61K33/00, 31:08) | [1996/07] | CPC: |
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61P23/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/00, A61K31/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/07] | Title | German: | ANALGETISCHE UND ANÄSTHETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/07] | English: | ANALGESIC ANAESTHETIC COMPOSITIONS | [1996/07] | French: | COMPOSITION D'UN ANESTHESIANT ANALGESIQUE | [1996/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/07] | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Request for further processing for: | 03.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.2003 | BE | 08.01.2003 | CH | 08.01.2003 | FR | 08.01.2003 | GR | 08.01.2003 | IT | 08.01.2003 | LI | 08.01.2003 | NL | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | DE | 09.04.2003 | LU | 21.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
BE | 08.01.2003 | ||
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
FR | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
DE | 09.04.2003 | ||
LU | 21.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
BE | 08.01.2003 | ||
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
DE | 09.04.2003 | ||
LU | 21.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
BE | 08.01.2003 | ||
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
DE | 09.04.2003 | ||
LU | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
BE | 08.01.2003 | ||
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
DE | 09.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
DE | 09.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2524956 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-8* page 6, line 1 - line 6; claim 5 * | [AD] - S. ARORA ET AL., "Self-administered mixture of entonox and isoflurane in labour", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBSTETRIC ANAESTHESIA, (1992), vol. 1, pages 199 - 202 [AD] 1-8 * abstract * |