EP0693132 - RAPAMYCIN ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
DE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
DE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1998/10] | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
DE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1997/22] | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For all designated states SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For all designated states SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states SANDOZ LTD. Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For all designated states SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For all designated states SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUESNIAUX, Valérie Schützenweg 7 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
SEDRANI, Richard Herrengrabenweg 15 CH-4054 Basle / CH | [1996/04] | Application number, filing date | 94913093.4 | 30.03.1994 | [1996/04] | WO1994EP01006 | Priority number, date | GB19930007491 | 08.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307491 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424304 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693132 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693132 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, A61K47/48, G01N33/577, A61K39/385, C12N5/16 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
C07K16/1292 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
G01N33/577 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/04] | Extension states | SI | 11.08.1995 | Title | German: | REPAMYCINBESTIMMUNG | [1996/04] | English: | RAPAMYCIN ASSAY | [1996/04] | French: | TITRAGE DE LA RAPAMYCINE | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02495 ; | [A]EP0450936 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]EP0524832 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 08, Database accession no. 90-053405, & JPH02495 A 19900105 (TOSOH CORP) [A] * abstract * |