EP0693052 - DEALLYLATION REAGENT AND DEALLYLATION METHOD USING SAID REAGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Jean-Marie Route du Large Saint-Laurent d'Agny F-69440 Mornant / FR | 02 /
BLART, Errol 11, allée des Platanes F-94700 Maison-Alfort / FR | 03 /
GENET, Jean-Pierre 70, rue d'Etienne d'Orve F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR | 04 /
LEMAIRE-AUDOIRE, Sandrine 38, boulevard Maillot F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | 05 /
SAVIGNAC, Monique 146, avenue de la Clairière F-911190 Gify/Yvette / FR | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Ricalens, François, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2009/28] |
Former [1996/04] | Ricalens, François, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriéte Industrielle, 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94913152.8 | 08.04.1994 | [1996/04] | WO1994FR00397 | Priority number, date | FR19930004233 | 09.04.1993 Original published format: FR 9304233 | [1996/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424088 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693052 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693052 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/62, C07K1/06, C07K1/12, B01J23/44 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
C07C209/62 (EP,US);
C07C213/08 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/52 (EP,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,US);
C07K1/061 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/62, C07C211/27 (EP,US);
C07C209/62, C07C211/28 (US,EP);
C07C209/62, C07C211/35 (US,EP);
C07C213/08, C07C215/30 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | DESALLYHERUNGSREAGENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR DESALLYHERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES REAGENZES | [1996/04] | English: | DEALLYLATION REAGENT AND DEALLYLATION METHOD USING SAID REAGENT | [1996/04] | French: | REACTIF DE DESALLYLATION, PROCEDE DE DESALLYLATION UTILISANT CE REACTIF | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2000 | Decision despatched | 24.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 21.01.1999 | Decision despatched | 21.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 12.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.01.2002 | LU | 08.04.2002 | MC | 08.04.2002 | DK | 09.04.2002 | PT | 09.04.2002 | SE | 09.04.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 09.01.2002 | |
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
DK | 09.04.2002 | ||
PT | 09.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | GR | 09.01.2002 | |
MC | 08.04.2002 | ||
PT | 09.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GR | 09.01.2002 | |
PT | 09.04.2002 | ||
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | PT | 09.04.2002 | |
SE | 09.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 09.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0194554 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 5, line 31 - page 9, line 10 *; | JPS6270392 [ ] (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [A]EP0407256 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9219643 (PROPEPTIDE SA [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 25 * * examples 13-15 *; | [X]EP0518295 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 45 - line 57 *; | [DPX]EP0566459 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [DPX] 1-7* the whole document * | [X] - R NOYORI ET AL., "preparation of oligonucleotides by platinum-group-compound-mediated deprotection of O-allyl and N-allyloxycarbonyl protected nucleotides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19881010), vol. 109, no. 15, Database accession no. 129602w, page 753 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - M KAMBER ET G JUST, "Gamma-phosphono-gamma-lactones. The use of allyl esters as easily removable phosphonate protecting groups", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, OTTAWA CA, (198504), vol. 63, no. 4, pages 823 - 827 [X] 1-5 * page 824, column DROITE, line 16 - page 825, column GAUCHE, line 14 * |