EP0737377 - PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRIC SWITCHGEAR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Rolf Ludwigstrasse 6 D-63785 Obernburg / DE | 02 /
GRONEMANN, Karl-Heinz Talstrasse 13 D-63128 Dietzenbach / DE | 03 /
MOSLER, Thomas Danneckerstrasse 41 D-60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1996/42] | Application number, filing date | 94913501.6 | 19.04.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994DE00515 | Priority number, date | DE19934313652 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4313652 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424744 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737377 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737377 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/24 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
H02B11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [1996/42] | Title | German: | ARBEITSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES SCHALTFELD | [1996/42] | English: | PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRIC SWITCHGEAR PANEL | [1996/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR TABLEAUX ELECTRIQUES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1478398 (MERLIN GERIN) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 50 - line 53 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [DA]DE8624915U (SACHSENWERK AG) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9003117U (ELEKTROTECHNISCHE WERKE FRITZ DRIESCHER & SÖHNE) [A] 1 * claims 1-5,8 ** figures 1,2 * | [A] - WILKE LÜBBEN ET AL., "Air-Insulated, Withdrawable Circuit-Breaker Switchgear, Type Tested to IEC 298", POWER ENGINEERING & AUTOMATION, ERLANGEN, (198506), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 146 - 163 [A] 1 * page 147, column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 4 * * page 148; figure 2 * * page 163; figure 4 * |