|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.07.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1999 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1998 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.11.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.11.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.10.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |