EP0695166 - PERFUME COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | 11.04.2008 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [2001/50] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL NEDERLAND BV Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | ||
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL NEDERLAND BV Huizerstraatweg 28 NL-1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHAN, John Martin Shermel Ball Lane Kennington Ashford Kent TN25 4EB / GB | 02 /
CLEMENTS, Christopher Francis 102 Bouverie Road West Folkestone Kent CT20 2LB / GB | 03 /
MARTIN, John Robert 16 Prenton Hall Road Prenton Birkenhead Merseyside L43 0RA / GB | 04 /
PERRING, Keith Douglas 14 Malvern Road Ashford Kent TN24 8HS / GB | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94913749.1 | 29.04.1994 | [1996/06] | WO1994GB00935 | Priority number, date | GB19930008953 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9308953 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9424999 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695166 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695166 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/46 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
C11D3/50 (EP);
A61K8/34 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61Q13/00 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D3/001 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
A61K2800/77 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [1996/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | PARFUMZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/06] | English: | PERFUME COMPOSITION | [1996/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PARFUM | [1996/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Michalski, Stefan, et al, et al Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
24.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative ter Meer, Nicolaus Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Michalski, Stefan, et al, et al Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte GbR Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr. TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr. TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Stevermann, Birgit, et al, et al Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr. TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Stevermann, Birgit, et al, et al Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 28.08.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.02.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.08.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.01.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/20] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 07.12.2004 | Appeal received No. T1345/04 | 03.02.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.01.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.11.2004 | Appeal received No. T1345/04 | 17.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0005618 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]EP0003171 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 35 - page 37; claim - *; | [D]US4322308 (HOOPER DAVID C, et al); | [D]US4289641 (HOOPER DAVID C, et al); | [DA]EP0003172 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-15 * page 43 - page 45; claim - *; | [A]EP0147191 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [DA]US4134838 (HOOPER DAVID C, et al) [DA] 1-20 * examples 4-7; claim - *; | [PX]EP0545556 (QUEST INT NEDERLAND [NL]) [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * |