EP0696349 - ANGULAR POSITION ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMES, Andrew, Nicholas 30 Butcher Close Milton Cambridge CB4 6ED / GB | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94913761.6 | 03.05.1994 | [1996/07] | WO1994GB00948 | Priority number, date | GB19930009073 | 01.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9309073 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425829 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696349 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696349 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
G06M1/274 (EP,US);
G01D5/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/07] | Title | German: | WINKELKODIERVORRICHTUNG | [1996/07] | English: | ANGULAR POSITION ENCODER | [1996/07] | French: | CODEUR DE POSITION ANGULAIRE | [1996/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/07] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4401986 (TRENKLER GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]GB2128752 (BROOKES & GATEHOUSE) [X] 1-13,22,23,26-29 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2217849 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13,22,23,26-29 * abstract * |