EP0656250 - APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING GATE CUT AND EJECTION FOR AN INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKYOKASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-14, Kugahara 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states SANKYOKASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-14, Kugahara 2-chome Ota-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNO, Masakazu Sankyokasei Kabushiki Kaisha 11-14, Kugahara 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZAWA, Yukio Nagaoka Plant Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. 5-1, Jooka 2-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata 940 / JP | 03 /
MIYAJIMA, Shoji Nagaoka Plant Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. 5-1, Jooka 2-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata 940 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Sumio Nagaoka Plant Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. 5-1, Jooka 2-chome Nagoaka-shi Niigata 940 / JP | 05 /
INAGE, Toshio Niigata Plant Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. 384-1, Shichikuyama Niigata-shi Niigata 950 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Motohiro Nagaoka Plant Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. 5-1, Jooka 2-chome Nagoaka-shi Niigata 940 / JP | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94913783.0 | 20.04.1994 | [1995/23] | WO1994JP00647 | Priority number, date | JP19930093402 | 20.04.1993 Original published format: JP 9340293 | JP19940007264 | 26.01.1994 Original published format: JP 726494 | [1995/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423926 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656250 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/40, B29C45/38, B29C45/76 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B29C45/7626 (EP);
B29C45/38 (EP);
B29C45/40 (EP);
B29C2045/764 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/23] | B29C45/40, B29C45/38 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/23] | Title | German: | KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTGRATEN UND ENTFORMEN AN EINER SPRITZGUSSMASCHINE UND KONTROLLVERFAHREN | [1995/23] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING GATE CUT AND EJECTION FOR AN INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [1995/23] | French: | APPAREIL POUR COMMANDER LES OPERATIONS DE COUPE DE LA COULEE ET D'EJECTION DANS UNE MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION ET PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER CET APPAREIL | [1995/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1994 | Translation filed | 13.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 13.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 03.12.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01244816 ; | [X]JPH058264 (CANON INC) [X] 14 * figure - *; | [A]JPS6471722 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891221), vol. 013, no. 582, Database accession no. (M - 911), & JP01244816 A 19890929 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [Y] 10-21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890623), vol. 013, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 841), & JP01071722 A 19890316 (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO) [A] 10-21 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0271614U ; | [Y]JPS60247533 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [Y]JPS62103123 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) |