EP0649916 - ORGANIC-COMPOSITE-PLATED STEEL PLATE AND COATING RESIN COMPOSITION USED FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAMURA, Shin'ichi 1-4-2-206, Umaminaka Koryo-cho Kitakutsuragi-gun Nara 635 / JP | 02 /
MIYAGAKI, Atsushi 3-3-311 Higashisukematsu-cho Izumiotsu-shi Osaka 595 / JP | 03 /
OHNISHI, Kiyoshi 5-3-103, Harumidai 3-chome Sakai-shi Osaka 590-01 / JP | 04 /
AMEMOTO, Masahide 4-1-306, Nishiki 2-chome Kaizuka-shi Osaka 592 / JP | 05 /
ODASHIMA, Hisao Hirohata Works Nippon Steel Corporation 1, Fuji-cho Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 06 /
SHIBATA, Keitaro Hirohata Works Nippon Steel Corporation 1, Fuji-cho Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 07 /
KASUYA, Akihiro Hirohata Works Nippon Steel Corporation 1, Fugi-cho Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 08 /
OHMORI, Kiyoshi Hirohata Works Nippon Steel Corporation 1, Fugi-cho Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94913804.4 | 22.04.1994 | [1995/17] | WO1994JP00674 | Priority number, date | JP19930097421 | 23.04.1993 Original published format: JP 9742193 | [1995/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425639 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649916 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/00, C23C22/86, B05D7/00, C08G18/67, C09D163/10, C08F299/02 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
B05D7/51 (EP);
C08G18/6705 (EP);
C09D163/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/17] | C23C22/00, C23C22/86 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1995/17] | Title | German: | MIT ORGANISCHEM KUNSTSTOFF BESCHICHTETES GALVANISIERTES STAHLBLOCH UND EINE BESCHICHTUNGSHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERWENDET FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1995/17] | English: | ORGANIC-COMPOSITE-PLATED STEEL PLATE AND COATING RESIN COMPOSITION USED FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1995/17] | French: | TOLE D'ACIER REVETUE D'UN MATERIAU COMPOSITE ORGANIQUE ET COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT A LA RESINE UTILISE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CELLE-CI | [1995/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1994 | Translation filed | 22.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/51] | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0298409 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0469646 (AKZO NV) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * example - * * claims 1,2,18,23-26 * | International search | [A]JPH02263633 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |