EP0750520 - MEDICAL DEVICES AND MATERIALS HAVING ENHANCED MAGNETIC IMAGES VISIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMACYCLICS, INC. 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-4521 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states PHARMACYCLICS, INC. 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Stuart, W. 45 Las Piedras Court Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Richard, A. 8 Ohlone Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94914129.5 | 12.04.1994 | [1997/01] | WO1994US04011 | Priority number, date | US19930047600 | 14.04.1993 Original published format: US 47600 | US19930086789 | 02.07.1993 Original published format: US 86789 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423782 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750520 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750520 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61L29/00 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
A61L29/14 (EP);
A61M25/01 (KR);
A61L29/00 (KR);
A61M25/0127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [2000/29] |
Former [1997/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND MATERIALIEN MIT ERHÖHTER SICHTBARKEIT BEI MAGNETISCHER BILDGEBUNG | [1997/01] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES AND MATERIALS HAVING ENHANCED MAGNETIC IMAGES VISIBILITY | [1997/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX ET MATERIAUX PRODUISANT DES IMAGES MAGNETIQUES A VISIBILITE AMELIOREE | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.1995 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8704080 (LONGMORE DONALD BERNARD) [A] 1-11,33-35,40-52,56,57,60* page 1, line 3 - line 8; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XDY]US4989608 (RATNER ADAM V [US]) [XD] 1-11,16,17,19-21,26-32,40-67 * column A * * column 2, line 1 - line 8 * * column 2, line 34 - line 40 * * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 34 * * column 9, line 19 - line 49; figures 1-9 * [YD] 12-15,18,22-25; | [YD]WO9210213 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [YD] 12-15,18,22-25 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 3, line 3 - line 10 * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 9 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 7; example 1 * |