EP0701681 - NO INTERFERENCE MECHANICAL-MAGNETIC ARROW SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR ARCHERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAURIZI, Maurizio Via Felice Barnabei, 1 I-65126 Pescara / IT | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 94914550.2 | 30.03.1994 | [1996/12] | WO1994IT00038 | Priority number, date | IT1993PE00002 | 31.05.1993 Original published format: IT PE930002 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428368 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701681 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F41B5/22 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
F41B5/1434 (EP);
F41B5/1438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH -MAGNETISCHE PFEILANLAGE FUER BOGEN | [1996/12] | English: | NO INTERFERENCE MECHANICAL-MAGNETIC ARROW SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR ARCHERY | [1996/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUSPENSION DE FLECHE MECANIQUE-MAGNETIQUE SANS INTERFERENCE | [1996/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 01.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/13] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1997 | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3499414 (FRYDENLUND ARTHUR J) [X] 1 * column 3, line 11 - line 68 * * figure - *; | [X]US3669059 (STUART FRANK T) [X] 1 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 13 * * figure - *; | [Y]US4343286 (THACKER BOBBY J) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 1,4,6,7 *; | [A]US4648376 (SAUNDERS CHARLES A [US]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 30 ** figures 6,7 *; | [Y]DE8812113U (WIENDAHL) [Y] 2 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 13 * * figure - *; | [A]US4860719 (SCHEITERLEIN ERNST [US]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 10 - line 45 * * figure - * |