EP0650386 - DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND REMOVING SKATE WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOFLACH SPORT GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Lackengasse 301 A-5541 Altenmarkt im Pongau / AT | [1995/45] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states Koflach Sport Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG Markt 39 A-5602 Wagrain / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERNER, Johann Harzerstrasse 26 A-8053 Graz / AT | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Sonn, Helmut SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Sonn, Helmut Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1995/18] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94914962.9 | 09.05.1994 | [1995/18] | WO1994AT00063 | Priority number, date | AT19930000934 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: AT 93493 | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426366 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650386 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650386 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/00 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
A63C17/06 (EP,US);
A63C17/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1995/18] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN UND LÖSEN VON ROLLEN | [1995/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND REMOVING SKATE WHEELS | [1995/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FIXER ET DE DETACHER DES ROULETTES | [1995/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.07.1998 | FR | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | NL | 22.07.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 22.07.1998 | ||
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 18.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB668710 (JUY LUCIEN CHARLES HIPPOLYTE) [Y] 1,3* figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2536290 (OLIVIERI ICARO & C [IT]) [Y] 1,3 * figure 1; claims 1-3 * |