EP0741884 - FUNDS TRANSACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calabro Services Co. L.L.C. 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states mCom Solutions Inc. 1013 Centre Road Wilmington, Delaware 19805 / US | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states DYNAMIC DATA SYSTEMS PTY. LTD. Level 14, 227 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELBAUM, Hector, Daniel 11 Harrington Place Doncaster East, VIC 3109 / AU | [2007/22] |
Former [1996/46] | 01 /
JEWELL, Raimonde, Victor, Ivan 15 Hunt Street Donvale, VIC 3111 / AU | ||
02 /
ELBAUM, Hector, Daniel 11 Harrington Place Doncaster East, VIC 3109 / AU | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [1996/46] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 94914984.3 | 13.05.1994 | [1996/46] | WO1994AU00247 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM03507 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: AU PM350794 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520195 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741884 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741884 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0741884 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G07F19/00, G07F7/10 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G07F7/1016 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/343 (EP,US);
G07F7/02 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | G06F17/60, G07F19/00, G07F7/10 | ||
Former IPC [1996/46] | G06F17/60, G07F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | GELDÜBERWEISUNGSGERÄT | [1996/46] | English: | FUNDS TRANSACTION DEVICE | [1996/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSACTION DE FONDS | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1996 | Search fee paid | 26.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2006 | 14.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2006 | BE | 08.11.2006 | CH | 08.11.2006 | IT | 08.11.2006 | LI | 08.11.2006 | NL | 08.11.2006 | DK | 08.02.2007 | SE | 08.02.2007 | DE | 09.02.2007 | GR | 09.02.2007 | ES | 19.02.2007 | PT | 09.04.2007 | LU | 13.05.2007 | IE | 14.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/24] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
DE | 09.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
IE | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
DE | 09.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
DE | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
DE | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0484198 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9306564 (KHYBER TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 7 * * page 7, line 14 - page 7, line 33 * * claims 1,15-21 ** figures 1,6 * | International search | [A]US4536647 (ATALLA MARTIN M [US], et al); | [A]US4727243 (SAVAR EUGENE [US]); | [A]AU6758290 (TRANSACTION TECHNOLOGY INC); | [A]WO9211598 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]AU2888692 (MONDEX INT LTD); | [A]EP0546584 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]AU2739292 (CITIBANK NA ); | [X]US5231569 (MYATT LARRY H [US], et al) |