EP0697027 - TETRAAROXYPERYLENE-3,4,9,10-TETRACARBOXYLIC ACID POLYIMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 2 D-80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLEN, Klaus Geisbergstrasse 139 D-50939 Köln / DE | 02 /
DOTCHEVA, Dobrinka, Todorova Gorsky-Patnik-Strasse 43 1407 Sofia / BG | 03 /
KLAPPER, Markus Danzingerstrasse 24 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Karg, Jochen BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | Karg, Jochen BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94915140.1 | 28.04.1994 | [1996/08] | WO1994EP01345 | Priority number, date | DE19934314622 | 04.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4314622 | [1996/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425504 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697027 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697027 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
C07D493/06 (EP,US);
C08G73/1067 (EP,US);
C08G73/1082 (EP,US);
C09B69/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/08] | Title | German: | TETRAAROXYPERYLEN-3,4,9,10-TETRACARBONSÄUREPOLYIMIDE | [1996/08] | English: | TETRAAROXYPERYLENE-3,4,9,10-TETRACARBOXYLIC ACID POLYIMIDES | [1996/08] | French: | POLYIMIDES D'ACIDE TETRAAROXYPERYLENE-3,4,9,10-TETRACARBOXYLIQUE | [1996/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0445577 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]JPS63110219 ; | [A]JPH0453894 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880921), vol. 12, no. 353, Database accession no. (C - 530)<3200>, & JP63110219 A 00000000 (TOSOH CORPORATION) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920604), vol. 16, no. 244, Database accession no. (C - 947)<5287>, & JP04053894 A 00000000 (NIHON KAGAKU HATSUKOU K.K.) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |