EP0696277 - HIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACCA, Joseph, P. 766 Eisenhauer Drive Telford, PA 18969 / US | 02 /
DORSEY, Bruce, D. 203 Continental Drive Harleysville, PA 19438 / US | 03 /
GUARE, James, P. 1600 Kumry Road Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | 04 /
HOLLOWAY, M., Katharine 171 Forest Trail Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 05 /
HUNGATE, Randall, W. 1925 Rampart Lane Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 06 /
LEVIN, Rhonda, B. 5 Forsythia Court Lafayette Hille, PA 19444 / US | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94915427.2 | 26.04.1994 | [1996/07] | WO1994US04621 | Priority number, date | US19930059038 | 07.05.1993 Original published format: US 59038 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426717 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696277 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/26, C07D241/04, C07D409/12, C07D401/06, C07D207/16, C07D401/12, C07C237/20, C07D409/06, A61K31/47, A61K31/495 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07C237/20 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/60 (EP,US);
C07D217/26 (EP,US);
C07D241/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/07] | Extension states | SI | 07.12.1995 | Title | German: | HIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIDS | [1996/07] | English: | HIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIDS | [1996/07] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEASE CODEE PAR LE VIH UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU SIDA | [1996/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/07] | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0432695 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-7 *Page7,line 40 - page 8, line 50* *Page 11-17: claims*; | [A]EP0434365 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-7 *Page 23, line 10 - page 34,line 30* *Page 83-101: claims*; | [A]EP0492136 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-7 *Page 59-71 : claims*; | [A]EP0539192 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-7 *Page 27-29: claims*; | [PA]EP0541168 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [PA] 1-7*Document* | [A] - NOEL A. ROBERTS ET. AL., SCIENCE, (19900420), vol. 248, no. 4953, pages 358 - 361 [A] 1-7 *Document* | [A] - TERRY A. LYLE ET. AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, (199103), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 1228 - 1230 [A] 1-7 *Document* |