EP0649539 - FREQUENCY CALIBRATION FOR MRI SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKARD, Todd, William 2235 East Woodstock Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1995/17] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94915935.4 | 28.04.1994 | [1995/17] | WO1994US04691 | Priority number, date | US19930060435 | 07.05.1993 Original published format: US 60435 | [1995/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9427159 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649539 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649539 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/28, G01R33/54, G01R33/58 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
G01R33/58 (EP,US);
G01R33/583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1995/17] | Title | German: | EICHUNG DER FREQUENZ FÜR BILDABTASTER MITTELS MAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | [1995/17] | English: | FREQUENCY CALIBRATION FOR MRI SCANNER | [1995/17] | French: | ETALONNAGE DE FREQUENCE POUR SCANNER MRI | [1995/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0289360 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 5 - line 53 * * page 4, line 47 - page 6, line 53 * * & US-A-4806866 * [D] ; | [A]EP0337588 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 19 * * column 9, line 2 - column 11, line 40 * * column 16, line 5 - line 32 * * column 17, line 39 - column 19, line 12 *; | [A]EP0391279 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 46 * * column 6, line 22 - line 38 *; | [AD]EP0463789 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 19 * * & US-A-5107215 * [D] ; | [A]EP0439119 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 23 - column 3, line 45 *; | [AD]US4952877 (STORMONT ROBERT S [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 10, line 41 - column 13, line 58 *; | [E]US5309102 (DECKARD TODD W [US]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document * |