EP0698117 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST CK-MB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜBNER-PARAJSZ, Christa Marienstrasse 11 D-82327 Tutzing / DE | 02 /
ESSIG, Ulrich Josef-von-Hirsch-Strasse 51 D-82152 Planegg / DE | 03 /
LANG, Fridl Herzogstandstrasse 2 D-82327 Tutzing / DE | 04 /
VOGEL, Rudolf Am Eselsberg 7 D-82362 Weilheim / DE | [1996/09] | Application number, filing date | 94916161.6 | 28.04.1994 | [1996/09] | WO1994EP01337 | Priority number, date | DE19934314254 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4314254 | [1996/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9425617 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698117 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698117 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, C12N5/00, G01N33/573 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CK-MB | [1996/09] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST CK-MB | [1996/09] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX CONTRE L'ISOENZYME CK-MB | [1996/09] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02012972.2 / EP1254913 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/16] | LU | 30.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0228174 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1-21*see the whole application and more particularly , claim 1, page 9, line 26 to page 10, line 15, page 27, lines 7-10. * | [Y] - D. WOLFSON ET AL., "Three rapid immunoassays for the detemination of creatine kinase MB", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, (199110), vol. 122, no. 4, pages 958 - 964 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole document* | [Y] - E. S. LIANIDOU ET AL., "Assay of creatine kinase isoenzyme MB in serum with time-resolved immunofluorometry", CLIN. CHEM., (1990), vol. 36, no. 9, pages 1679 - 1683 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole document* | [Y] - U. PIRAN ET AL., "Immunochemiluminometric Assay of creatine kinase MB with a monoclonal antibody to the MB isoenzyme", CLIN. CHEM., (1987), vol. 33, no. 9, pages 1517 - 1520 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole document* | [Y] - M. N. BADMINGTON ET AL., "Evaluation of a new rapid immunometric method for the measurement of the MB isoenzyme of creatine kinase in serum", ANN. CLIN. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 29, pages 563 - 564 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole document* | [A] - H. C. VAIDYA ET AL., "Direct measurement of creatine kinase MB activity in serum after extraction with a monoclonal antibody specific to the MB isoenzyme", CLIN. CHEM., (1986), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 657 - 663 [A] 1-21 *see the whole document* | Examination | - APPLE F, ET AL., "Clinical and analytical evaluation of two immunoassays for direct measurement of creatine kinase MB with two monoclonal anti-CK-MB antibodies.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 34, no. 11, pages 2364 - 2367 |