EP0696906 - VASCULAR IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states Kernforschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEHRLEIN, Christoph In der Aue 12 D-69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
FEHSENFELD, Peter Ringstrasse 13 D-76297 Stutensee / DE | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Rückert, Friedrich Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Stabsabteilung Innovation Postfach 36 40 76021 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/27] | Rückert, Friedrich Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | Rückert, Friedrich, Dr. Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Stabsabteilung Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1996/08] | Rückert, Friedrich, Dr. Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 94916177.2 | 29.04.1994 | [1996/08] | WO1994EP01373 | Priority number, date | DE19934315002 | 06.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315002 | [1996/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426205 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696906 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696906 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61N5/10 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61K51/12 (EP,US);
A61K51/1282 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61N5/1002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/16, A61L31/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LI [1996/08] | Title | German: | GEFÄSSIMPLANTAT | [1996/08] | English: | VASCULAR IMPLANT | [1996/08] | French: | IMPLANT VASCULAIRE | [1996/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3750653 (SIMON N) [A] 1,7,10 * column 7, line 41 - line 67; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US4706652 (HOROWITZ BRUCE S [US]); | [XA]WO9203179 (GOOD ROGER R [US]) [X] 1,7,10,11 * page 12, line 11 - line 23; claims 1-9 * * table - * [A] 2-6,8,9; | [A]EP0497495 (MED INST INC [US]); | [A]WO9304735 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 11, line 7 - line 13 *; | [A]US5199939 (DAKE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 18 - line 45 * * column 6, line 6 - line 35 *; | [AD]EP0539165 (FISCHELL ROBERT [US], et al) [AD] 1,7,10 * column 2, line 3 - line 34 * |