EP0649309 - USE OF PARTICLES OF A BIOCOMPATIBLE, BIOABSORBABLE CALCIUM SALT AS ACTIVE PRINCIPLE IN THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR LOCAL TREATMENT OF BONE DEMINERALIZING DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED c/o Morgan & Morgan Trust Corp. Ltd., Road Town, Pasea Estate Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states BIO HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED c/o Morgan & Morgan Trust Corp. Ltd., Road Town, Pasea Estate Tortola / VG | ||
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states INOTEB Le Guernol F-56920 Saint-Gonnery / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATAT, Jean-Louis 176, boulevard Malesherbes F-75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
CIROTTEAU, Yves 191, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Hubert, Philippe Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1995/17] | Tonnellier, Jean-Claude Nony & Associés, 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94916274.7 | 11.05.1994 | [1995/17] | WO1994FR00564 | Priority number, date | FR19930005783 | 13.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305783 | [1995/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426283 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649309 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649309 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/10, A61K33/06, A61L27/00 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/191 (EP,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K33/10 (EP,US);
A61K33/42 (EP,US);
A61L27/025 (EP,US);
A61L27/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L27/3616 (EP);
A61L27/365 (EP,US);
A61L27/38 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/17] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TEILCHEN EINES BIOVERTRÄGLICHEN UND BIORESORBIERBAREN KALZIUMSALZES ALS WIRKSTOFF IN DER HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR LOKALEN BEHANDLUNG VON ENTKALKUNGSKRANKHEITEN | [1995/17] | English: | USE OF PARTICLES OF A BIOCOMPATIBLE, BIOABSORBABLE CALCIUM SALT AS ACTIVE PRINCIPLE IN THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR LOCAL TREATMENT OF BONE DEMINERALIZING DISEASES | [1995/17] | French: | UTILISATION DE PARTICULES D'UN SEL DE CALCIUM BIOCOMPATIBLE ET BIORESORBABLE COMME INGREDIENT ACTIF DANS LA PREPARATION D'UN MEDICAMENT DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT LOCAL DES MALADIES DEMINERALISANTES DE L'OS | [1995/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8601726 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,9-12 * page 10, line 1 - line 5 * * page 17, line 14 - line 35; examples 2,5-7; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO8703491 (EWERS ROLF [DE]) [X] 1,4,11 * page 2, line 24 - line 29 * * page 4, line 25 - line 30; claims 1-5 *; | [XY]WO8906944 (BESINS THIERRY RAINIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * page 4, line 1 - line 21 * * page 11, line 29 - line 35 * * page 12, line 1 - line 17 * * abstract * [Y] 10; | [X]FR2637502 (DUROSELLE PATRICK [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11 * page 2, line 21 - line 25 * * page 4, line 18 *; | [X]EP0395187 (INTERPORE INTERNATIONAL [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9,11,12 * page 3, line 13 - line 17 * * page 4, line 42 - line 53; claims 1,2,19 *; | [Y]DE4130546 (BAYLINK DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 10* column 1, line 61 - line 67; claims 1,5,6 * |