EP0703865 - THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTING DYESHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, 9 Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1996/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACK, Barry 188 Ashcroft Road Ipswich Suffolk 1P1 6AF / GB | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Hall, David Brian Intellectual Property Dept., ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd., P.O. Box 11, The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Hall, David Brian Intellectual Property Dept., ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd., P.O. Box 11, The Heath Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1996/14] | Hall, David Brian Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94916314.1 | 27.05.1994 | [1996/14] | WO1994GB01154 | Priority number, date | GB19930012351 | 16.06.1993 Original published format: GB 9312351 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429116 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703865 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703865 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/40, B41M5/26 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/443 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US);
B41M5/426 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | FARBBLATT FÜR WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSDRUCK | [1996/14] | English: | THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTING DYESHEET | [1996/14] | French: | FEUILLE DE COLORANT POUR IMPRESSION PAR TRANSFERT THERMIQUE | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.1997 | DK | 19.03.1997 | ES | 19.03.1997 | GR | 19.03.1997 | IT | 19.03.1997 | NL | 19.03.1997 | IE | 27.05.1997 | LU | 27.05.1997 | PT | 19.06.1997 | SE | 19.06.1997 | MC | 30.11.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
NL | 19.03.1997 | ||
IE | 27.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
NL | 19.03.1997 | ||
IE | 27.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 01.12.1997 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
NL | 19.03.1997 | ||
IE | 27.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
IE | 27.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
IE | 27.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
MC | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 19.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0295483 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US])[A] 1,9-11,15,16; | [A]EP0314348 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-8,10,15,16; | [A]EP0458522 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-8,15,16 |