EP0651851 - CELLULAR SHADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INTERNATIONAL NV P.O. Box 3623, Caracasbaaiweg 40 Curacao / AN | [1995/48] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INC. 2 Park Way & Route 17 South Upper Saddle River, New Jersey 07458 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGER, Raymond, A. 709 Spruce Street Aspen, CO 81611 / US | 02 /
COLSON, Wendell, B. 1412 Old Tale Road Boulder, CO 80303 / US | [1995/19] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94916643.3 | 04.05.1994 | [1995/19] | WO1994US04868 | Priority number, date | US19930058162 | 04.05.1993 Original published format: US 58162 | [1995/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425719 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651851 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/06 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
E06B9/06 (KR);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/524 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/344 (EP,US);
B29C66/437 (EP,US);
B29C66/836 (EP,US);
D06H5/00 (EP,US);
D06J1/12 (EP,US);
E06B9/262 (EP,US);
E06B9/266 (EP,US);
E06B9/40 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29L2031/719 (EP,US);
D10B2503/02 (EP,US);
D10B2503/03 (EP,US);
E06B2009/2441 (EP,US);
E06B2009/2622 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/19] | Title | German: | NETZARTIGE SONNENBLENDE | [1995/19] | English: | CELLULAR SHADE | [1995/19] | French: | STORE VENITIEN A CELLULES | [1995/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 04.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4194550 (HOPPER THOMAS P [US]); | [Y]US4943454 (NEFF CRAIG A [US]); | [Y]US5104469 (COLSON WENDELL B [US]); | [A]US5158632 (COLSON WENDELL B [US], et al) |