EP0711450 - PLANAR TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 D-33106 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖMER, Friedhelm Ringstrasse 13 D-33129 Delbrück / DE | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94916901.5 | 10.06.1994 | [1996/20] | WO1994DE00654 | Priority number, date | DE19934325056 | 26.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4325056 | [1996/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503617 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711450 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711450 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/14 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
H01F29/146 (EP,US);
H01F2029/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1996/20] | Title | German: | PLANAR-TRANSDUKTOR | [1996/20] | English: | PLANAR TRANSDUCER | [1996/20] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR PLANAIRE | [1996/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.01.1997 | BE | 30.06.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/41] | BE | 30.06.1997 | |
Former [1998/23] | BE | 30.06.1997 | |
Former [1997/49] | BE | 22.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB618398 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [XA]FR1068736 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * page 2, column L, line 12 - line 25 * [A] 6; | [A]US2690536 (ADAMS JR RALPH G) [A] 4 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB735304 (RAOUL WILLHEIM) [A] 7 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE2544574 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 9 * page 5, paragraph 3 *; | [A]FR2468983 (SOBIEPANEK JANUSZ [FR]); | [A]DE3312124 (SCHUNTERMANN UND BENNINGHOVEN [DE]) [A] 8 * page 23, line 2 - line 30 *; | [A]DE3433973 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]) |