EP0652968 - DEFECTIVE ADENOVIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/20] | DEFECTIVE ADENOVIRUSES AND CORRESPONDING COMPLEMENTATION LINES | ||
[2000/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSGENE S.A. 11, rue de Molsheim 67082 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | [1997/06] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states TRANSGENE S.A. 11, rue de Molsheim F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMLER, Jean-Luc 5a, rue des Mineures F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
METHALI, Majid 16 Impasse de Reims F-67400 Illkirch-Graffenstaden / FR | 03 /
PAVIRANI, Andréa 11 rue de la Baronne d'Oberkirch F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Barth, Renate, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Barth, Renate, Dr., et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/20] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94917063.3 | 27.05.1994 | [1995/20] | WO1994FR00624 | Priority number, date | FR19930006482 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9306482 | [1995/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428152 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652968 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652968 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/861, C12N5/10, A61K39/235, A61K48/00, C12N15/12, C12N15/31, C12N7/04 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/395 (EP,US);
C07K14/4712 (EP,US);
C07K14/57 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10322 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10352 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10362 (EP,US);
C12N2830/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/002 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/20] | C12N15/86, C12N15/34, C12N5/10, A61K48/00, C12N15/12, C12N7/04, C12N15/23, A61K39/235, C12N15/31 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | DEFEKTE ADENOVIREN | [2000/47] | English: | DEFECTIVE ADENOVIRUSES | [2000/47] | French: | ADENOVIRUS DEFECTIFS | [2000/47] |
Former [1995/20] | DEFEKTIVE ADENOVIREN UND ENTSPRECHENDEN TRANSKOMPLEMENTANTEN ZELLLINIEN | ||
Former [1995/20] | DEFECTIVE ADENOVIRUSES AND CORRESPONDING COMPLEMENTATION LINES | ||
Former [1995/20] | ADENOVIRUS DEFECTIFS ET LIGNEES DE COMPLEMENTATION CORRESPONDANTES | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 14.04.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP01111931.0 / EP1149916 | EP98124036.9 / EP0919624 | EP98124037.7 / EP0919625 | EP98124038.5 / EP0919626 | EP98124039.3 / EP0919627 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9306223 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 3 *; | [E]WO9412649 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [E] 1-10,15,24,26,27,30-32,42,43,46,49,50,52-55* the whole document *; | [A] - BABISS, L.E., "The cellular transcription factor E2F requires viral E1A and E4 gene products for increased DNA-binding activity and functions to stimulate adenovirus E2A gene expression", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (198906), vol. 63, no. 6, pages 2709 - 2717, XP000999846 [A] 1,2 * page 2715, column 2, line 53 - line 54 * * page 2716, column 1, line 6 - line 9 * | [A] - STATFORD-PERRICAUDET, L. & PERRICAUDET, M., "Gene transfer into animals: the promise of adenovirus", HUMAN GENE TRANSFER, (1991), vol. 219, pages 51 - 61, XP002105749 [A] 1 * page 58, paragraph 6 * | [A] - ROSENFELD, M.A. ET AL., "In vivo transfer of the human cystic fibrosis transmembrane conductance gene to the airway epithelium", CELL., CAMBRIDGE, NA US, (19920110), vol. 68, no. 1, pages 143 - 155, XP002064228 [A] 9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(92)90213-V | Examination | WO9408026 | WO9411506 | WO9424297 | WO9425073 | WO9426915 |