EP0696185 - APPARATUS, PRODUCT AND USE RELATED TO INTRALUMINAL PHOTOTHERMOFORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/07] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR INTRALUMINAL PHOTOTHERMOFORMING | ||
[1998/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOCAL, INC. 4 Maguire Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1998/33] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states FOCAL, INC. 4 Maguire Foad Lexington, MA 02173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATHAK, Chandrashekhar, P. 3102 Stearns Hill Road Waltham, MA 02154 / US | 02 /
SAWHNEY, Amarpreet, S. 148 Church Street Newton, MA 02158 / US | 03 /
HUBBELL, Jeffrey, A. 1020 Darby Road San Marino California 91108 / US | 04 /
HERMAN, Stephen, J. 28 Summer Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | 05 /
ROTH, Laurence, A. 8 Jackman Ridge Road Windham, NH 03087 / US | 06 /
CAMPBELL, Patrick, K. 45 East Street Georgetown, MA 01833 / US | 07 /
BERRIGAN, Kevin, M. 10 Manning Street Woburn, MA 01833 / US | 08 /
JARRETT, Peter, K. 1063 Georges Hill Road Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 09 /
COURY, Arthur, J. 154 Warren Avenue Boston, MA 02116 / US | [1996/13] |
Former [1996/07] | 01 /
PATHAK, Chandrashekhar, P. 3102 Stearns Hill Road Waltham, MA 02154 / US | ||
02 /
SAWHNEY, Amarpreet, S. 148 Church Street Newton, MA 02158 / US | |||
03 /
HUBBELL, Jeffrey, A. 413 Silver Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
04 /
HERMAN, Stephen, J. 28 Summer Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
05 /
ROTH, Laurence, A. 8 Jackman Ridge Road Windham, NH 03087 / US | |||
06 /
CAMPBELL, Patrick, K. 45 East Street Georgetown, MA 01833 / US | |||
07 /
BERRIGAN, Kevin, M. 10 Manning Street Woburn, MA 01833 / US | |||
08 /
JARRETT, Peter, K. 1063 Georges Hill Road Southbury, CT 06488 / US | |||
09 /
COURY, Arthur, J. 154 Warren Avenue Boston, MA 02116 / US | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94917290.2 | 28.04.1994 | [1996/07] | WO1994US04824 | Priority number, date | US19930054385 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: US 54385 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424962 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696185 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696185 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61B17/22 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2/945 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
B29C35/08 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (EP,US);
B29C55/24 (EP,US);
B29C70/74 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22001 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0047 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0833 (EP,US);
B29C49/0042 (EP,US);
B29K2995/006 (EP,US);
B29L2023/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/13] |
Former [1996/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, PRODUKT UND VERWENDUNG BETREFFEND DIE INTRALUMINALE PHOTOTHERMOFORMGEBUNG | [1998/33] | English: | APPARATUS, PRODUCT AND USE RELATED TO INTRALUMINAL PHOTOTHERMOFORMING | [1998/33] | French: | METHODE, PRODUIT ET USAGE RELATIFS AU MOULAGE PHOTOTHERMIQUE INTRALUMINAL | [1998/33] |
Former [1996/07] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTRALUMINALEN PHOTOTHERMOFORMGEBUNG | ||
Former [1996/07] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR INTRALUMINAL PHOTOTHERMOFORMING | ||
Former [1996/07] | METHODE ET APPAREIL DE MOULAGE PHOTOTHERMIQUE INTRALUMINAL | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.1998 | BE | 12.08.1998 | GR | 12.08.1998 | NL | 12.08.1998 | DK | 12.11.1998 | SE | 12.11.1998 | PT | 23.11.1998 | IE | 28.04.1999 | LU | 28.04.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
GR | 12.08.1998 | ||
NL | 12.08.1998 | ||
DK | 12.11.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
GR | 12.08.1998 | ||
NL | 12.08.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.04.1999 | ||
MC | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
GR | 12.08.1998 | ||
NL | 12.08.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.04.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
GR | 12.08.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.04.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
SE | 12.11.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
PT | 23.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 12.08.1998 | |
BE | 12.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 12.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4669465 (MOORE GARY L [US], et al) [X] 43,49,59,67 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0355200 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 43,49,59,67 * abstract *; | [X]EP0446178 (SCHNEIDER EUROP AG [CH]) [X] 43,49,59,67* abstract *; | [X]US5100429 (SINOFSKY EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 43-70,73-75,79-88,90-95,100-105,109-111 * column W *; | [XP]EP0540290 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [XP] 70,73,94 * column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 44; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US4575373 | WO9001969 |