EP0706677 - IMPROVEMENTS IN THREE DIMENSIONAL IMAGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUTAN PTY LIMITED 11 George Street Homebush, New South Wales 2140 / AU | [1996/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Donald, Lewis, Maunsell 3/53a Shadforth Street Mosman, NSW 2088 / AU | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 94917511.1 | 06.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994AU00298 | Priority number, date | AU1993PL09560 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: AU PL956093 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500880 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706677 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03B35/24, G02B27/22, H04N13/04, H04N13/00 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
G03B35/24 (EP,KR);
G02B30/32 (EP);
H04N13/31 (EP);
H04N13/32 (EP);
H04N13/398 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/16] | G03B35/24, G02B27/22, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BEI DER ERZEUGUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER BILDER | [1996/16] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN THREE DIMENSIONAL IMAGERY | [1996/16] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A LA FORMATION D'IMAGES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 09.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 18.02.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2029300 (NEWTON ARFSTEN) [X] 1,2,7 * column W * [A] 4,6,8,10-12; | [X]DE895067 (SCHENK KARL, et al) [X] 1,2* column W * | International search | [XY]JP02066514 ; | [Y]GB481879 (LESLIE PETER DUDLEY); | [XY]GB570594 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD, et al); | [Y]GB577820 (FRANCOIS SAVOYE); | [Y]GB602794 (SEMEN PAVLOVITCH IVANOV); | [A]US4807965 (GARAKANI REZA G [US]); | [XY]SE462637 (MAGNUS REDHE); | [Y]DE4038475 (STADLER WALTER [DE]); | [Y]GB2252175 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]); | [Y]AU1307692 (STEREOPTICS LTD) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, P-1053, page 160; & JP,A,02 066 514 (SHIMADZU CORP), 6 March 1990 (06.03.90). abstract, & JP02066514 A 19900306 |