EP0700406 - RANDOM COPOLYMERS OF PROPYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSTING, Meinolf Friedelsheimer Strasse 12 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 02 /
LANGHAUSER, Franz Salinenstrasse 103 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 03 /
KERTH, Juergen Wattenheimer Strasse 15 D-67316 Carlsberg / DE | 04 /
SCHWEIER, Guenther Friedrich-Pietzsch-Strasse 14 D-67159 Friedelsheim / DE | [1996/11] | Application number, filing date | 94917639.0 | 17.05.1994 | [1996/11] | WO1994EP01592 | Priority number, date | DE19934317654 | 27.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4317654 | [1996/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428039 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700406 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700406 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/06, C08F2/34, C08F4/622, C08L23/12, C08L53/00 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
D01F6/30 (EP);
C08F210/06 (EP);
C08L23/142 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F210/08, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/08, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1996/11] | Title | German: | STATISTISCHE COPOLYMERISATE DES PROPYLENS | [1996/11] | English: | RANDOM COPOLYMERS OF PROPYLENE | [1996/11] | French: | COPOLYMERISATS STATISTIQUES DU PROPYLENE | [1996/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
14.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | 02
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE-BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Troch, Geneviève, et al, et al Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | 03
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Chemical Patents Inc. 4500 Bayway Drive Baytown, Texas 77520 / US Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 04
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Union Carbide Corporation 39 Old Ridgebury Road US-Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 05
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 DK - 2800 LYNGBY / DK Opponent's representative Cockbain, Julian, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 06
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Zanoli, Enrico, et al, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | 07
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48640 / US Opponent's representative Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
14.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | ||
02
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE-BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Troch, Geneviève, et al, et al Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | |||
03
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Chemical Patents Inc. 4500 Bayway Drive Baytown, Texas 77520 / US Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
04
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Union Carbide Corporation 39 Old Ridgebury Road US-Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
05
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 DK - 2800 LYNGBY / DK Opponent's representative Cockbain, Julian, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
06
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Zanoli, Enrico, et al, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | |||
07
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48640 / US Opponent's representative Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1998/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
14.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | ||
02
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE-BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Troch, Geneviève, et al, et al Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | |||
03
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Chemical Patents Inc. 4500 Bayway Drive Baytown, Texas 77520 / US Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
04
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Union Carbide Corporation 39 Old Ridgebury Road US-Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
05
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 DK - 2800 LYNGBY / DK Opponent's representative Cockbain, Julian, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | |||
06
15.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Zanoli, Enrico, et al, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | |||
07
16.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48640 / US Opponent's representative Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1998/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
14.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | ||
02
14.01.1998
28.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE-BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Troch, Geneviève, et al, et al Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | |||
Former [1998/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
14.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | 24.02.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.08.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M09) | 17.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.10.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0433990 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0355447 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0316692 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * claim -; table 1 *; | [A]EP0263718 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-7,12,13 * page 5, line 49 - page 8, line 28 * * page 11, line 60 - page 15, line 46 * * claim -; table - * |