EP0654031 - STEREOSELECTIVE SYNTHESIS OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES USING BICYCLIC INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOCHEM PHARMA INC 275 Armand Frappier Boulevard Laval Quebec H7V 4A7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states BIOCHEM PHARMA INC. 275 Armand Frappier Boulevard Laval, Quebec H7V 4A7 / CA | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states BIOCHEM PHARMA INC. 275 Armand-Frappier Boulevard Laval, Quebec H7V 4A7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSOUR, Tarek, S. Apartment 102 3555 University Street Montreal, Quebec H3A 2B1 / CA | 02 /
EVANS, Colleen, A. Apartment 102 3555 University Street Montreal, Quebec H3A 2B1 / CA | 03 /
JIN, Haolun Apartment 308 9880 Gouin Boulevard Pierrefonds, Quebec H8Y 3H3 / CA | 04 /
SIDDIQUI, Arshad, M. Apartment 117 2700 Thimens Boulevard St-Laurent, Quebec H4R 2C4 / CA | 05 /
TSE, Allan, H., L. Apartment 303 1420 Quenneville Street St-Laurent, Quebec H4N 1V7 / CA | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94918252.1 | 07.06.1994 | [1995/21] | WO1994CA00311 | Priority number, date | GB19930011709 | 07.06.1993 Original published format: GB 9311709 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429301 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654031 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654031 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D411/04, C07D473/00, C07D497/08, // (C07D497/08, 327:00, 317:00) | [1995/21] | CPC: |
C07D473/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D411/04 (EP,US);
C07D497/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | STEREOSELEKTIVE SYNTHESE VON NUKLEOZIDEN ANALOGEN MIT HILFE VON BICYCLISCHER ZWISCHENVERBINDUNG | [1995/21] | English: | STEREOSELECTIVE SYNTHESIS OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES USING BICYCLIC INTERMEDIATE | [1995/21] | French: | SYNTHESE STEREOSELECTIVE D'ANALOGUES DE NUCLEOSIDES AU MOYEN D'UN INTERMEDIAIRE BICYCLIQUE | [1995/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 31.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.1999 | GR | 29.12.1999 | PT | 29.03.2000 | LU | 07.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 29.12.1999 | |
GR | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 29.12.1999 | |
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 29.12.1999 | |
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 29.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0382526 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) [A] 1 *Page 29-40 : claims*; | [A]WO9111186 (UNIV EMORY [US]) [A] 1 *Page 22-44,claims* and formulasheets. *; | [A]WO9117159 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) [A] 1 *Page 30-31: claims*; | [A]WO9210496 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1 *Page 27-29* and formulasheets *; | [A]EP0515157 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) [A] 1*Page 47-55: claims*; | [A]EP0526253 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) [A] 1 *Document*; | [A]WO9303027 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) [A] 1 *Page 29-31: claims* |