EP0708770 - AMIDE DERIVATIVES OF 16-MEMBERED RING ANTIBIOTIC MACROLIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDY, Kristin, Marie Apartment 631 600 Meridian Street Extension Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
VU, Chi, B. 26 Hyde Park Drive Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Moore, James William Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road GB-Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94918498.0 | 04.07.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994IB00199 | Priority number, date | US19930092181 | 15.07.1993 Original published format: US 92181 | US19940193316 | 08.02.1994 Original published format: US 193316 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502594 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708770 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708770 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D407/12, A61K31/35, C07D405/14, A61K31/415, A61K31/495, C07D495/02, C07D495/04, C07H17/08 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | AMID-DERIVATE VON 16-GLIEDRIGE HETEROCYCLEN ALS ANTIBIOTISCHE MACROLIDE | [1996/18] | English: | AMIDE DERIVATIVES OF 16-MEMBERED RING ANTIBIOTIC MACROLIDES | [1996/18] | French: | DERIVES D'AMIDES DE MACROLIDES ANTIBIOTIQUES A NOYAU DE 16 ELEMENTS | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.1997 | BE | 16.04.1997 | DK | 16.04.1997 | ES | 16.04.1997 | FR | 16.04.1997 | GR | 16.04.1997 | IT | 16.04.1997 | IE | 04.07.1997 | LU | 04.07.1997 | PT | 16.07.1997 | SE | 16.07.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
ES | 16.04.1997 | ||
GR | 16.04.1997 | ||
IT | 16.04.1997 | ||
IE | 04.07.1997 | ||
LU | 04.07.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
ES | 16.04.1997 | ||
GR | 16.04.1997 | ||
IT | 16.04.1997 | ||
IE | 04.07.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
GR | 16.04.1997 | ||
IT | 16.04.1997 | ||
IE | 04.07.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
GR | 16.04.1997 | ||
IT | 16.04.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
IT | 16.04.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
DK | 16.04.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
BE | 16.04.1997 | ||
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 16.04.1997 | |
PT | 16.07.1997 | ||
FR | 12.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 16.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0052005 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [DX]GB2135670 (LILLY CO ELI) [DX] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US4804749 (FUJIWARA TATSURO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [DX]US4920103 (KIRST HERBERT A [US], et al) [DX] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [DX]US4921947 (TAO EDDIE V P [US], et al) [DX] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0394135 (ADIR [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]JPH05117292 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) [Y] 1-13 * Compounds I * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, no. 24, Database accession no. 93-191504 [ ] * abstract * |