EP0707011 - STEROL COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Yasuji 18-12, Nanyodai 2-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-03 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGISHI, Takehiro Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Weisert, Annekäte, et al Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94918589.6 | 28.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994JP01044 | Priority number, date | JP19930159814 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15981493 | [1996/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501367 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707011 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, A61K31/575, A61K31/56 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C07J9/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | STEROL-VERBINDUNG | [1996/16] | English: | STEROL COMPOUND | [1996/16] | French: | COMPOSE STEROLIQUE | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1995 | Translation filed | 18.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/24] | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0467664 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2* the whole document * | [PX] - K. IGUCHI ET AL, "Aragusterol A, B and C; potent antitumor marine steroids from the Okinawan sponge of the genus Xestospongia", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940829), vol. 121, no. 9, Database accession no. 99238, page 44, column 1 [PX] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - TENNEN YUKI KAGOBUTSU TORONKAI KOEN YASHISHU, no. 35, pages 274 - 281 | [PX] - H. SHIMURA ET AL, "Aragusterol: a novel halogenated marine steroid from an Okinawan sponge, Xestospongia sp., possessing potent antitumor activity", EXPERIENTIA, BASEL CH, (19940215), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 134 - 136 [PX] 1,2 * the whole document * | [PA] - J. KOBAYASHI ET AL, "Xestosterols A, B and C, new C29 Steroids with a cyclopropane ring from the Okinawan marine sponge Xestospongi", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, vol. 56, no. 8, pages 1350 - 1355 [PA] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [P]JPH054998 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD ) |