EP0707749 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR JOINTING CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABELDON AB Box 531 441 15 Alingsas / SE | [1998/34] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states KABELDON AB Box 531 S-441 15 Alingsas / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖGLUND, Mikael Sjöhagsvägen 16 S-440 07 Sjövik / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Bert Radmansvägen 1 C S-441 50 Alingsas / SE | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 94918642.3 | 06.06.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994SE00544 | Priority number, date | SE19930001932 | 07.06.1993 Original published format: SE 9301932 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429938 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707749 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707749 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/14 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
H02G1/14 (EP,US);
H02G15/1826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49194 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49195 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49199 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM VERBINDEN VON KABELN | [1996/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICES FOR JOINTING CABLES | [1996/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIFS DE RACCORDEMENT DE CABLES | [1996/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3001158 (COSSONAY CABLERIES TREFILERIES); | [X]US4968857 (MCGRANE EUGENE W [US]) |