EP0660681 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR DRAWERS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO. Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16 D-32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [1995/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTHOFF, Detlev Im Leubrink 1 D-32584 Löhne / DE | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 94918742.1 | 23.06.1994 | [1995/27] | WO1994DE00736 | Priority number, date | DE19930010582U | 15.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9310582 U | [1995/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502349 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660681 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660681 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
A47B88/467 (EP,US);
A47B88/427 (EP,US);
A47B2088/4235 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0016 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0018 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1996/48] |
Former [1995/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | RASTEINRICHTUNG FÜR SCHUBKÄSTEN UND DGL. | [1995/27] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR DRAWERS AND THE LIKE | [1995/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARRET POUR TIROIRS ET EQUIVALENT | [1995/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9011033 (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP0421458 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1; | [A]DE4103045 (NINKAPLAST GMBH.) [A] 1,8 |