EP0655012 - ASSEMBLY AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING BLOOD | ||
[1998/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway - 2E Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLOTTI, Marc 804 Furlong Drive Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 02 /
KARLOVSKY, Daniel, M. 714 East Crestwood Drive Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Samira, E. 98 Linden Road Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94919437.7 | 09.06.1994 | [1995/22] | WO1994US06536 | Priority number, date | US19930077288 | 14.06.1993 Original published format: US 77288 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428996 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655012 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655012 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D37/00, B01D21/26, B01D39/00, A61M1/02 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B01D21/262 (EP,US);
A61M1/0222 (EP,US);
A61M1/0227 (EP,US);
A61M1/0231 (EP,US);
A61M1/0236 (EP,US);
A61M1/3652 (EP,US);
A61M2039/222 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0429 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0439 (EP,US);
B01D2221/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0429, A61M2202/0042 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0439, A61M2202/0057 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/22] | B01D37/00, B01D21/26, B01D39/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BLUT | [1998/20] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING BLOOD | [1998/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DU SANG | [1998/20] |
Former [1995/22] | SYSTEME UND METHODEN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BLUT | ||
Former [1995/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING BLOOD | ||
Former [1995/22] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DU SANG | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 10.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]FR2695037 (PALL CORP [US]) [PA] 1,2,5,8,10* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5092996 (SPIELBERG RICHARD [US]); | [A]US5128048 (STEWART MARY A [US], et al); | [Y]US5180504 (JOHNSON KENNETH M [US], et al); | [Y]US5217627 (PALL DAVID B [US], et al) |