EP0658221 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 1 4860 Lenzing / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 1 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIKELI, Stefan Schacha 14 A-4844 Regau / AT | 02 /
ECKER, Friedrich St. Annastrasse 10 A-4850 Timelkam / AT | 03 /
SCHWENNINGER, Franz Erlenweg 20 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | 04 /
JURKOVIC, Raimund Hauptstrasse 27 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | 05 /
RÜF, Hartmut Pilgrimstrasse 6 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Schwarz, Albin, Dr. Albertgasse 10/8 Postfach 224 A-1081 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94919458.3 | 29.06.1994 | [1995/25] | WO1994AT00083 | Priority number, date | AT19930001291 | 01.07.1993 Original published format: AT 129193 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501470 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658221 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658221 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/00, D01D5/06, D01D5/088 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
D01D5/06 (EP,US);
D01F2/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Extension states | SI | 24.02.1995 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG CELLULOSISCHER FASERN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1995/25] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE FIBRES | [1995/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN UVRE DUDIT PROCEDE | [1995/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 23.03.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [D]DE2844163 (AKZONA INC); | [A]US4416698 (MCCORSLEY III CLARENCE C [US]); | [PA]WO9319230 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [PA] 1-6 * the whole document * |