EP0705074 - APPARATUS FOR LOCATING FUNCTIONAL STRUCTURES OF THE LEG DURING KNEE SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/15] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING FUNCTIONAL STRUCTURES OF THE LOWER LEG DURING KNEE SURGERY | ||
[1999/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. 59 Route 17 Allendale, New Jersey 07401 / US | ||
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states OSTEONICS CORP. 59 Route 17 Allendale New Jersey 07401-1677 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANCE, Mark, N. 1461 Walnut Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 3R2 / CA | 02 /
SALVESTRO, Aldo, T. 2964 East 25th Avenue Vancouver, Bristish Columbia V5R 1J2 / CA | 03 /
AUCHINLECK, Geoffrey, F. 1182 West 7th Avenue 5 Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 1B4 / CA | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1999/02] | Hammond, Andrew David Göteborgs Patentbyra AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1996/35] | Hammond, Andrew David Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1996/15] | Hammond, Andrew Albihn West AB Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 94919530.9 | 21.06.1994 | [1996/15] | WO1994CA00340 | Priority number, date | US19930081028 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: US 81028 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500075 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705074 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705074 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/4528 (EP,US);
A61B17/154 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B5/103 (EP,US);
A61F2/4657 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/15] | A61B17/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LOKALISIERUNG FUNKTIONELLER STRUKTUREN DES BEINS WÄHREND DER KNIEGELENKSCHIRURGIE | [1999/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LOCATING FUNCTIONAL STRUCTURES OF THE LEG DURING KNEE SURGERY | [1999/31] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER DES STRUCTURES FONCTIONNELLES DE LA JAMBE PENDANT UNE CHIRURGIE DU GENOU | [1999/31] |
Former [1996/15] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALISIERUNG VON FUNKTIONELLEN STRUKTUREN WÄHRENDKNIEGELENKCHIRURGIE | ||
Former [1996/15] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING FUNCTIONAL STRUCTURES OF THE LOWER LEG DURING KNEE SURGERY | ||
Former [1996/15] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER DES STRUCTURES FONCTIONNELLES DU BAS DE LA JAMBE PENDANT UNE CHIRURGIE DU GENOU | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Request for further processing for: | 20.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4979949 (MATSEN III FREDERICK A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column A *; | [DA]US4524766 (PETERSEN THOMAS D [US]) [DA] 1 * column A *; | [A]WO8807840 (CEMAX INC [US]) |