EP0708079 - 2-HYDROXYPROPANEDIAMINE DERIVATIVE AND DETERGENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITSUKI, -Tomohito 1450, Nishihama Wakayama-shi Wakayama 649-62 / JP | 02 /
UNO, Mitsuru 1130, Nishihama Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | 03 /
KITA, Katsumi 1655, Nagataki Izumisano-shi Osaka 598 / JP | 04 /
FUJIKURA, Yoshiaki 1-3-6, Fujimigaoka Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 320 / JP | 05 /
NAKANO, Akiko 131, Hishiya-higashi Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 578 / JP | 06 /
TOSAKA, Masaki 5-12-15, Nakakuki Oyama-shi Osaka 596 / JP | 07 /
YAHAGI, Kazuyuki 3-2-6-601, Tachibana Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | 08 /
TAMURA, Shigeru 49-1, Mukunoki Kainan-shi Wakayama 640-11 / JP | 09 /
MARUTA, Kazunari 1, 1-banchi Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | [1996/28] |
Former [1996/17] | 01 /
KITSUKI, Tomohito 1450, Nishihama Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | ||
02 /
UNO, Mitsuru 1130, Nishihama Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | |||
03 /
KITA, Katsumi 1655, Nagataki Izumisano-shi Osaka 598 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIKURA, Yoshiaki 1-3-6, Fujimigaoka Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 320 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKANO, Akiko 131, Hishiya-higashi Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 578 / JP | |||
06 /
TOSAKA, Masaki 5-12-15, Nakakuki Oyama-shi Tochigi 323 / JP | |||
07 /
YAHAGI, Kazuyuki 3-2-6-601, Tachibana Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | |||
08 /
TAMURA, Shigeru 49-1, Mukunoki Kainan-shi Wakayama 640-11 / JP | |||
09 /
MARUTA, Kazunari 1, 1-banchi Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94919884.0 | 11.07.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994JP01129 | Priority number, date | JP19930170447 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17044793 | JP19930170448 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17044893 | JP19930335780 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33578093 | JP19930335788 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33578893 | JP19930335789 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33578993 | [1996/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501955 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708079 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708079 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/12, C07C233/20, C07C235/08, C07C309/13, C07C309/17, C11D1/92, C07C233/38, C07C309/14, C07C233/18, C07C233/36, C07C235/10, C11D1/28 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/68 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
C07C229/12 (EP,US);
C07C229/16 (EP,US);
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C233/20 (EP,US);
C07C233/36 (EP,US);
C07C233/38 (EP,US);
C07C235/08 (EP,US);
C07C235/10 (EP,US);
C07C305/06 (EP,US);
C07C309/14 (EP,US);
C07C309/17 (EP,US);
C11D1/10 (EP,US);
C11D1/28 (EP,US);
C11D3/0094 (EP,US);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/17] | C07C229/12, C07C233/20, C07C235/08, C07C309/13, C07C309/17, C11D1/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1996/17] | Title | German: | 2-HYDROXYPROPANDIAMINDERIVATE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE DETERGENZZUBEREITUNG | [1996/17] | English: | 2-HYDROXYPROPANEDIAMINE DERIVATIVE AND DETERGENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME | [1996/17] | French: | DERIVE DE 2-HYDROXY-PROPANEDIAMINE ET COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT LE CONTENANT | [1996/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1996 | Translation filed | 08.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.04.1999 | FR | 14.04.1999 | GB | 14.07.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 14.04.1999 | |
GB | 14.07.1999 | ||
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/07] | GB | 14.07.1999 | |
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 10.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP0463801 (CLOROX CO [US]); | [A]GB1383741 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [XA]US3689544 (SCANLON PATRICIA M, et al) |