EP0744017 - NONINVASIVE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING RESONANCE INFORMATION FOR ROTATING MACHINERY COMPONENTS AND FOR ANTICIPATING COMPONENT FAILURE FROM CHANGES THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONITORING TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 2731 Prosperity Drive Fairfax, VA 22031 / US | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Walter, C. 10700 River Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
PAGE, Edward, A. 9620 Kensington Parkway Kensington, MD 20895 / US | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94919973.1 | 05.04.1994 | [1996/48] | WO1994US03736 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527183 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744017 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744017 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00, G01M13/04, G01B7/00 | [1999/15] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1998/43] | G01B7/00, G01H1/00, G01M13/04 | ||
Former IPC [1996/48] | G01B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DER RESONANZBEDINGUNGEN VON BAUELEMENTEN EINER ROTIERENDEN MASCHINE MIT VORHERSAGE VON BAUELEMENTFEHLERN DURCH ÄNDERUNG DIESER BEDINGUNGEN | [1999/15] | English: | NONINVASIVE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING RESONANCE INFORMATION FOR ROTATING MACHINERY COMPONENTS AND FOR ANTICIPATING COMPONENT FAILURE FROM CHANGES THEREIN | [1996/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL NON-INVASIFS POUR OBTENIR DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A LA RESONANCE DANS DES COMPOSANTS DE MACHINES TOURNANTES ET POUR ANTICIPER DES DEFAILLANCES DANS CES COMPOSANTS A LA SUITE DE CHANGEMENTS S'Y PRODUISANT | [1996/48] |
Former [1996/48] | NICHTINVASIVES VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DER RESONANZBEDINGUNGEN VON BAUELEMENTEN EINER ROTIERENDEN MASCHINE MIT VORHERSAGE VON BAUELEMENTFEHLERN DURCH ÄNDERUNG DIESER BEDINGUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 21.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.05.1996 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | 28.05.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.05.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.02.2000 | ES | 09.02.2000 | GR | 09.02.2000 | NL | 09.02.2000 | IE | 05.04.2000 | LU | 05.04.2000 | DK | 09.05.2000 | PT | 09.05.2000 | MC | 31.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
GR | 09.02.2000 | ||
NL | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
DK | 09.05.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
NL | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
DK | 09.05.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/18] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
NL | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
NL | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
MC | 30.04.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
NL | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
ES | 09.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
IE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | BE | 09.02.2000 | |
PT | 09.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | BE | 09.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5115671 (HICHO MICHAEL D [US]); | [X]US5109700 (HICHO MICHAEL D [US]); | [X]US4302813 (KURIHARA NOBUO, et al); | [X]US4426641 (KURIHARA NOBUO [JP], et al); | [X]US4352293 (KURIHARA NOBUO, et al) |