EP0700402 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MODULATION OF THE IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE ACTIVITY AND TOXICITY OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tolerance therapeutics, Inc. 5421 S.Kenwood Avenue, Chicago Illinois, 60615 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Tolerance therapeutics, Inc. 5421 S.Kenwood Avenue Chicago, Illinois, 60615 / US | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Bluestone, Jeffrey A. 5421 S. Kenwood Avenue Chicago IL 60615 / US | ||
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states ARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 1101 East 58th Street, The University of Chicago Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUESTONE, Jeffrey, A. 5421 S. Kenwood Avenue Chicago, IL 60615 / US | 02 /
ZIVIN, Robert, A. 6 Glenbrook Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
JOLLIFFE, Linda 301 Tall Oak Lane Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/40] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, 52 Bounds Green Road London N11 2EY / GB | ||
Former [1996/11] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920062.0 | 01.06.1994 | [1996/11] | WO1994US06198 | Priority number, date | US19930070116 | 01.06.1993 Original published format: US 70116 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428027 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700402 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700402 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/46, C07K16/28 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/11] | C07K15/28, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Stoffe zur Modulation der immunsuppressiven Aktivität und Toxitätvon monoklonalen Antikörpern | [1996/11] | English: | METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MODULATION OF THE IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE ACTIVITY AND TOXICITY OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES | [1996/11] | French: | PROCEDES ET MATIERES DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITE IMMUNODEPRESSIVE ET DE LA TOXICITE D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX | [1996/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Request for further processing for: | 20.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.1999 | Decision despatched | 05.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 24.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9109968 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 11 * * claim - * | [DX] - M. ALEGRE ET AL., "Effect of a single amino acid mutation on the activating and immunosuppressive properties of a", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE MD, USA, (19920601), vol. 148, no. 11, pages 3461 - 3468 [DX] 1-17 * the whole document * | [DX] - E. WOODLE ET AL., "Humanized OKT3 antibodies: Successful transfer of immune modulating properties and idiotype expression.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE MD, USA, (19920501), vol. 148, no. 9, pages 2756 - 2763 [DX] 1-17 * abstract * * page 2761, column R, line 50 - page 2762, column L, line 13 * | [X] - S. BOLT ET AL., "The generation of a humanized, non-mitogenic CD3 monoclonal antibody which retains in vitro immunosuppressive properties.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, GERMANY, (199302), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 403 - 411 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - L. JOLLIFFE, "Humanized antibodies: Enhancing therapeutic utility through antibody engineering.", INTERNATIONAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 10, no. 2-3, pages 241 - 250 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * |