EP0703978 - MEDIUM FOR LONG-TERM PROLIFERATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states AMGEN INC. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1789 / US | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states AMGEN INC. Amgen Center, 1840 Dehavilland Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1789 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONTING, Ian L.O. 6158 Coral Pink Circle Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920264.2 | 17.06.1994 | [1996/14] | WO1994US06893 | Priority number, date | US19930079719 | 18.06.1993 Original published format: US 79719 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500632 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703978 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703978 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
C12N2500/25 (EP,US);
C12N2500/36 (EP,US);
C12N2500/40 (EP,US);
C12N2500/90 (EP,US);
C12N2501/11 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/135 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | MEDIUM ZUR LANGFRISTIGE VERMEHRUNG UND ENTWICKLUNG VON ZELLEN | [1996/14] | English: | MEDIUM FOR LONG-TERM PROLIFERATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CELLS | [1996/14] | French: | MILIEU DE DEVELOPPEMENT ET DE PROLIFERATION A LONG TERME DES CELLULES | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 05.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.1999 | BE | 18.08.1999 | CH | 18.08.1999 | FR | 18.08.1999 | IT | 18.08.1999 | LI | 18.08.1999 | NL | 18.08.1999 | DE | 19.11.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
CH | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 18.08.1999 | ||
LI | 18.08.1999 | ||
NL | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
CH | 18.08.1999 | ||
LI | 18.08.1999 | ||
NL | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
CH | 18.08.1999 | ||
LI | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
CH | 18.08.1999 | ||
LI | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
CH | 23.11.1999 | ||
LI | 23.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 18.08.1999 | |
BE | 18.08.1999 | ||
DE | 19.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | DE | 19.11.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9218615 (INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-20* examples 1,2,4; claims 1-11,27-32 *; | [A]WO9309220 (CORREA PAULO N [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-19 * | [A] - L. DOUAY ET AL., "THE ROLE OF RECOMBINANT HAEMATOPOIETIC GROWTH FACTORS IN HUMAN LONG-TERM BONE MARROW CULTURE IN SERUM-FREE MEDIUM.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (199109), vol. 79, no. 1, pages 27 - 32 [A] 1-20 * page 27, column R, line 12 - page 28, column L, line 10 * | Examination | - LIPSON, S. M., "Application of a Serum-Free Medium in the Growth and Differentiation of Human Peripheral Blood Lymphocytes", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGICAL INFECTIOUS DISEASES, NEW YORK, (19860301), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 203 - 214 | - VINCENT, F., ET AL, "Human Blood-derived Macrophages: Differentiation in vitro of a Large Quantity of Cells in Serum-Free Medium", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (19920101), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 17 - 23 | - Sigma Cell Culture Reagents Catalogue 1992, pages 20, 60, 61, 67-70 and 77 |