EP0699113 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A CABLE OR WIRE, PARTICULARLY DIAMOND CHARGED FOR CUTTING BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIAMANT BOART Société Anonyme Avenue du Pont de Luttre, 74 1190 Bruxelles / BE | [1997/40] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states DIAMANT BOART Société Anonyme Avenue du Pont de Luttre, 74 B-1190 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITEHEAD, James Bte 12 Avenue des Prisonniers Politiques 4 B-1150 Woluwé-Saint-Pierre / BE | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1996/10] | Claeys, Pierre, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 94920860.7 | 25.07.1994 | [1996/10] | WO1994BE00046 | Priority number, date | BE19930000773 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: BE 9300773 | [1996/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503147 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699113 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699113 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23D57/00, B28D1/08 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
B23D57/0061 (EP);
B23D61/185 (EP);
B28D1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT [1998/13] |
Former [1997/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [1996/18] | BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT | ||
Former [1996/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN EINES SÄGEDRAHTES ODER SÄGEKABELS | [1996/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A CABLE OR WIRE, PARTICULARLY DIAMOND CHARGED FOR CUTTING BLOCKS | [1996/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN CABLE OU FIL, EN PARTICULIER DIAMANTE, POUR LA COUPE DANS DES BLOCS | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 15.01.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DE, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE | 20.06.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61274203 ; | [A]DE1236396 (WILHELM ELLERICH); | [A]US4067312 (TESSNER ROY LYNNARD) [A] 1,16 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2655904 (DIAMIND SA [FR]) [A] 22 * figures 1,2; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5176055 (WIJESINGHE RALPH [CA], et al) [A] 1,16 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870428), vol. 11, no. 134, Database accession no. (P - 571), & JP61274203 A 19861204 (KOMATSU LTD) [A] 1,16 * abstract * |