EP0661250 - MULTILAYER-COATED GRANULAR FERTILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Hiroshi 2804-42, Kosugayacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | 02 /
TAKASE, Shunsuke, Room 7-401 Asahi Kasei Nishi Apartment, 100, Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416 / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | Blake, John Henry Francis BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921113.0 | 19.07.1994 | [1995/27] | WO1994JP01178 | Priority number, date | JP19930180318 | 21.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18031893 | [1995/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503260 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661250 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661250 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C05G3/00, C05G5/00 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
C05G5/37 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05G5/37, C05G5/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | GRANULIERTES DÜNGEMITTEL MIT EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN UMHÜLLING | [1995/27] | English: | MULTILAYER-COATED GRANULAR FERTILIZER | [1995/27] | French: | ENGRAIS GRANULAIRE A REVETEMENT EN PLUSIEURS COUCHES | [1995/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1994 | Translation filed | 11.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4329012B ; | [A]US3264089 (HANSEN LOUIS I) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3259482 (HANSEN LOUIS I) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4155992 (SCHMITT EDWARD E [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 66-35492F, XP002043067 & JPS4329012B B1 00000000 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0597561 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH03146492 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [P]JPH05201787 (GRACE W R & CO) |