EP0668298 - MALEIC ACID COPOLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/34] | MALEIC COPOLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF | ||
[1998/20] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shigeru 2-1111-306, Shiromidai Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670 / JP | 02 /
TSUBOI, Keishi 11-26, Midorigaoka Ookubo-cho, Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674 / JP | 03 /
IRIE, Yoshio 3253-3, Fumatsu-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 679-21 / JP | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1995/34] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921115.5 | 18.07.1994 | [1995/34] | WO1994JP01180 | Priority number, date | JP19930178946 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17894693 | JP19940049375 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4937594 | JP19940121578 | 02.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12157894 | [1995/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503342 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668298 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668298 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F22/06, C11D3/37, D06L1/00, D06M15/263, C08F222/02 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C08F222/02 (EP,US);
C09D17/004 (EP,US);
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D3/3757 (EP,US);
D06L1/12 (EP,US);
D06L4/12 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/34] | C08F22/06, C11D3/37, D06L1/00, D06M15/263 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/34] | Title | German: | MALEINSÄURECOPOLYMER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN ANWENDUNG | [1998/20] | English: | MALEIC ACID COPOLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF | [1998/20] | French: | COPOLYMERE D'ACIDE MALEIQUE, SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION ET SON UTILISATION | [1998/20] |
Former [1995/34] | MALEINCOPOLYMER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN ANWENDUNG | ||
Former [1995/34] | MALEIC COPOLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [1995/34] | COPOLYMERE MALEIQUE, SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1995 | Translation filed | 09.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98113054.5 / EP0874008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas(UK) Ltd. European Patent Department, City Point One Ropemaker Street London, EC2Y 9HS / GB Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | 02
23.12.1999
11.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | 03
24.12.1999
12.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas(UK) Ltd. European Patent Department, City Point One Ropemaker Street London, EC2Y 9HS / GB Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
02
23.12.1999
11.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | |||
03
24.12.1999
12.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2004/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas(UK) Ltd. European Patent Department, City Point One Ropemaker Street London, EC2Y 9HS / GB Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Patent Department 28th Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
02
23.12.1999
11.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | |||
03
24.12.1999
12.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2003/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | ||
02
23.12.1999
11.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | |||
03
24.12.1999
12.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2000/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | ||
02
23.12.1999
11.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | |||
03
24.12.1999
12.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2000/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1999
28.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US Opponent's representative Buckley, Guy Julian, et al, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | 15.02.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.08.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.05.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/36] | Appeal following opposition | 25.06.2002 | Appeal received No. T0658/02 | 22.08.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2003 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2003/27] | 30.10.2003 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2003/44] | 27.05.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH03124711 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JPS59213714 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH02120399 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP); | [X]JPH051121 (TOSOH CORP) |