EP0707775 - APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING COMPRESSED NON-INTERLACED SCANNED VIDEO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING COMPRESSED NON-INTERLACED SCANNED VIDEO SIGNAL | ||
[1998/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UZ, Kamil, Metin Apartment 201 1573 Vista Club Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 94921317.7 | 17.06.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994US06867 | Priority number, date | US19930088475 | 07.07.1993 Original published format: US 88475 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502302 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707775 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707775 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/46 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
H04N19/37 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (KR);
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1996/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KOMPRIMIERTEN BILDSIGNALEN OHNE ZEILENSPRUNG | [1998/35] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING COMPRESSED NON-INTERLACED SCANNED VIDEO SIGNAL | [1998/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE SIGNAUX VIDEO COMPRIMES A BALAYAGE NON ENTRELACE | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/17] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG VON KOMPRIMIERTEN BILDSIGNALEN OHNE ZEILENSPRUNG | ||
Former [1996/17] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING COMPRESSED NON-INTERLACED SCANNED VIDEO SIGNAL | ||
Former [1996/17] | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE SIGNAUX VIDEO COMPRIMES A BALAYAGE NON ENTRELACE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 13.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5144425 (JOSEPH KURIACOSE [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 11 * [A] 3,4,7-10; | [A]US5148272 (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 25 - line 40 *; | [AY]EP0542195 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 15; figure 1 * [Y] 6; | [YA] - YANBIN YU ET AL., "Interlaced Video Coding with Field-Based Multiresolution Representation", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930201), vol. 5, no. 1/2, pages 185 - 198, XP000345620 [Y] 1,2,5,6 * page 189, column L, line 22 - column R, line 11; figure 4 * [A] 3,4,7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(93)90034-Q | [A] - A. PURI ET AL., "Video Coding with Motion-Compensated Interpolation for CD-ROM Applications", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19900801), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 127 - 144, XP000243473 [A] 1-10 * paragraph [05.2]; figure 4E * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(90)90016-B |