EP0713580 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE TEMPERATURE OF AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMSHOFF, Horst-Werner Gerberstrasse 30a D-45468 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
INTICHAR, Lutz Haarzopfer Strasse 12 D-45472 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
SCHEIL, Hermann Adlerstrasse 17 D-91334 Hemhofen / DE | [1996/22] | Application number, filing date | 94921597.4 | 26.07.1994 | [1996/22] | WO1994DE00863 | Priority number, date | DE19934326680 | 09.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326680 | [1996/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504936 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713580 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713580 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/34, G01K1/02 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
G01K1/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1996/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEMPERATURÜBERWACHUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN GENERATORS | [1996/22] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE TEMPERATURE OF AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR | [1996/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER LA TEMPERATURE D'UNE GENERATRICE ELECTRIQUE | [1996/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3535550 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [DA]EP0192373 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [X]EP0209364 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) |