EP0689662 - SHAPED CHARGE FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF AMMUNITION UNDERWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAeSEMA Limited 40/44 Coombe Road New Malden, Surrey KT3 4QF / GB | [1996/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILEY, David BAeSEMA Limited P.O. Box 5 Filton Bristol BS12 7QW / GB | 02 /
DENMAN, Trevor BAeSEMA Limited P.O. Box 5 Filton Bristol BS12 7QW / GB | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Eastmond, John Corporate IPR Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Eastmond, John Corporate IPR Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921739.2 | 29.07.1994 | [1996/01] | WO1994GB01620 | Priority number, date | GB19930015668 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9315668 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504252 | Date: | 09.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689662 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/08 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
F42B3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [1996/01] | Title | German: | HOHLLADUNG ZUM VERNICHTEN VON MUNITION UNTER WASSER | [1996/01] | English: | SHAPED CHARGE FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF AMMUNITION UNDERWATER | [1996/01] | French: | CHARGE CREUSE UTILISEE DANS LA DESTRUCTION DE MUNITIONS SOUS-MARINES | [1996/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/09] | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | 20.06.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | 20.06.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | 20.06.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | 20.06.1995 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | 20.06.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.07.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   19.07.1995 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3623240 (MESSERSCHMITT-BÖLKOW-BLOHM GMBH) [X] 1-8 * column 1, lines 34-44; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 55-68 * * column 3, lines 6-47 *; | [X]GB2234203 (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [X] 1-8 * page 2, lines 16-28; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2221285 (S. ALFORD) [X] 1-8 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, line 3 * * page 10, paragraphs 1-2; figure . *; | [X]US3759182 (R. LEVAMAKI) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4114537 (A. BROWN) [X] 1-8 * column 1, lines 16-30; figure . * * column 2, lines 15-58 *; | [X]FR2106860 (SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 1; figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 15 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 9 *; | [A]US3695141 (S. KRONMAN); | [A]US3117518 (L. PORTER) |