EP0708625 - SOFT TISSUE AUGMENTATION KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/18] | SOFT TISSUE AUGMENTATION APPARATUS | ||
[2002/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHINDLER, Robert 3609 21st Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 02 /
MAAS, Corey 130 Currey Avenue Sausalito, CA 94965 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94922121.2 | 12.07.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994US07737 | Priority number, date | US19930090518 | 12.07.1993 Original published format: US 90518 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502376 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708625 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708625 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61B17/34 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/0059 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/18] | A61F2/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WEICHES GEWEBE | [1996/18] | English: | SOFT TISSUE AUGMENTATION KIT | [2002/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUGMENTATION DU TISSU MOU | [1996/18] |
Former [1996/18] | SOFT TISSUE AUGMENTATION APPARATUS | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 05.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2003 | GR | 02.01.2003 | DK | 02.04.2003 | PT | 02.04.2003 | LU | 12.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
LU | 12.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 02.01.2003 | |
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | PT | 02.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2643555 (MACGREGOR DAVID [US]) [A] 2,5 * page 2, line 20 - line 36 * * page 3, line 2 - line 5 ** page 7, line 10 - line 13 *; | [A]DE4004921 (MEES KLAUS PROF DR MED [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,7 * column 1, line 30 - line 33 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 11 * * column 5, line 41 - line 55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9210218 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 31 * * page 14, line 3 - line 14 * * figures 11,12 * | International search | [XY]US4306318 (MANO HIROSHI, et al); | [XY]US5147387 (JANSEN DAVID W [US], et al) | Examination | US3106483 | US4306318 | US4838280 | US4936835 | US5147387 |