EP0712548 - ARCHITECTURE AND INTERCONNECT SCHEME FOR PROGRAMMABLE LOGIC CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTR, INC. 1 East 1st Street Reno, NV 89501 / US | [1997/05] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states ADVANTAGE LOGIC INC. Suite 456, 20863 Stevens Creek Boulevard Cupertino CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TING, Benjamin, S. 21120 Sullivan Way Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94922455.4 | 24.06.1994 | [1996/21] | WO1994US07187 | Priority number, date | US19930101197 | 03.08.1993 Original published format: US 101197 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504404 | Date: | 09.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0712548 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712548 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/177 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
H03K19/17704 (EP,US);
H03K19/17728 (EP,US);
H03K19/17736 (EP,US);
H03K19/1778 (EP,US);
H03K19/17796 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/21] | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR-UND BESCHALTUNGSSCHEMA FÜR PROGRAMMIERBARE LOGISCHE SCHALTUNGEN | [1996/21] | English: | ARCHITECTURE AND INTERCONNECT SCHEME FOR PROGRAMMABLE LOGIC CIRCUITS | [1996/21] | French: | PLAN D'ARCHITECTURE ET D'INTERCONNEXION POUR CIRCUITS LOGIQUES PROGRAMMABLES | [1996/21] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/40: Teilanmeldung 97111287.5 eingereicht am 04/07/97 | EPB 1997/40: Divisional application 97111287.5 filed on 04/07/97 | EPB 1997/40: Demande divisionnaire 97111287.5 déposée le 04/07/97 | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 01.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97111287.5 / EP0806836 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Request for further processing for: | 12.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2003 | BE | 02.04.2003 | CH | 02.04.2003 | FR | 02.04.2003 | IT | 02.04.2003 | LI | 02.04.2003 | NL | 02.04.2003 | IE | 24.06.2003 | LU | 24.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | DK | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | PT | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | DE | 03.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FR | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 24.06.2003 | ||
LU | 24.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FR | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 24.06.2003 | ||
LU | 24.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FR | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 24.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 24.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DE | 03.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.04.2003 | |
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.04.2003 | |
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2180382 (PILKINGTON MICRO ELECTRONICS) [A] 1-3* figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0415542 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4-15 *; | [XA]WO9208286 (CONCURRENT LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page P9, line 15 - line 27; figure 3 * * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 14; figures 5,6 * * page 10, line 15 - page 12, line 7; figures 7-9 * * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 8; figure 3 * * page 10, line 29 - line 30 * * page 15, line 20 - line 35 * [A] 9,13,6,4,7 | [X] - CLIFF ET AL, "a dual granularity and globally interconnected architecture for a programmable logic device", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1993 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, (199305), pages 7.3.1 - 7.3.5 [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * | [X] - BRITTON ET AL, "optimized reconfigurable cell array architecture for high-performance field programmable gate arrays", IEEE 1993 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK (US), (199305), pages 7.2.1 - 7.2.5 [X] 1-3 * figures 2-4 * | Examination | US4982114 |