EP0713616 - CURRENT DRIVER WITH SHUTDOWN CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICREL INCORPORATED 1849 Fortune Drive San Jose, CA 94131 / US | [1996/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNIG, Bruce L. 3157 Bimber Crescent San Jose, CA 95148 / US | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94922625.2 | 19.07.1994 | [1996/22] | WO1994US08132 | Priority number, date | US19930104319 | 09.08.1993 Original published format: US 104319 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505032 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713616 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/687, H03K17/56 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
H03K17/0826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/22] | Title | German: | STROMTREIBER MIT ABSCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [1996/22] | English: | CURRENT DRIVER WITH SHUTDOWN CIRCUIT | [1996/22] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE COURANT AVEC CIRCUIT D'ARRET | [1996/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 06.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/32] | 07.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3347498 (ISKRA SOZD ELEKTRO INDUS [YU]) [X] 1,6 * page 10, line 23 - line 28 * * page 13, line 1 - line 29; figure 2 *; | [A]US4888498 (KADAKIA SHAILESH R [US]) [A] 2 * column 4, line 11 - line 18; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5138515 (BOURGEOIS JEAN-MARIE [FR]); | [AP]US5272392 (WONG STEPHEN L [US], et al); | [AP]US5272399 (TIHANYI JENOE [DE], et al); | [AP]US5270585 (TISINGER ERIC W [US]) |