EP0708850 - COMPOSITE YARN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE YARN HAVING A SPANDEX CORE AND A TEXTURIZED THERMOPLASTIC COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/18] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE YARN HAVING A SPANDEX CORE AND A TEXTURIZED THERMOPLASTIC COVERING | ||
[1997/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worldtex, Inc. P.O. Box 2363 Hickory, NC 28603 / US | [1996/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETZER, Barry Dean P.O. Box 2506 Hickory, NC 28603 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Lieck, Hans-Peter, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Lieck, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lieck, Endlich & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 36 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94923395.1 | 11.07.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994US07701 | Priority number, date | US19930093349 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: US 93349 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502721 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708850 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708850 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/32 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
D02J1/08 (EP,US);
D02G3/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | VERBUNDFADEN UND METHODE ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES VERBUNDFADENS DER EINEN SPANDEX-KERN UND EINE TEXTURIERTE THERMOPLASTISCHE UMMANTELUNG AUFWEIST | [1997/40] | English: | COMPOSITE YARN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE YARN HAVING A SPANDEX CORE AND A TEXTURIZED THERMOPLASTIC COVERING | [1997/40] | French: | FIL COMPOSITE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FIL COMPOSITE A AME SPANDEX ET REVETEMENT THERMOPLASTIQUE TEXTURE | [1997/40] |
Former [1996/18] | METHODE ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES VERBUNDFADENS DER EINEN SPANDEX-KERN UND EINE TEXTURIERTE THERMOPLASTISCHE UMMANTELUNG AUFWEIST | ||
Former [1996/18] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE YARN HAVING A SPANDEX CORE AND A TEXTURIZED THERMOPLASTIC COVERING | ||
Former [1996/18] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FIL COMPOSITE A AME SPANDEX ET REVETEMENT THERMOPLASTIQUE TEXTURE | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.1997 | BE | 01.10.1997 | CH | 01.10.1997 | DK | 01.10.1997 | ES | 01.10.1997 | GR | 01.10.1997 | LI | 01.10.1997 | NL | 01.10.1997 | SE | 01.01.1998 | PT | 02.01.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
ES | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
IE | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
IE | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
GR | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
BE | 01.10.1997 | ||
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
CH | 01.10.1997 | ||
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
LI | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
PT | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 01.10.1997 | |
DK | 01.10.1997 | ||
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 01.01.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0157710 (PAYEN & CIE L [FR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0400838 (JONES STROUD & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [AP] - FERDINAND BÖSCH, "HFP-Prozess mit zugkraftgeregelter Fadenzuführung für elastische Verbundgarne", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, HEIDELBERG DE, (199403), vol. 75, no. 3, pages 178 - 180 [AP] 1-11 | Examination | - MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, vol.75, no.3, March 1994HEIDELBERG DE pages 178 - 180 FERDINAND B\SCH 'HFP-Prozess mit zugkraftgeregelter Fadenzuf}hrung f}r | - elastische Verbundgarne' |