EP0727088 - SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AUSTRIA AG 3943 Schrems-Eugenia 1 / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AUSTRIA AG A-3943 Schrems-Eugenia 1 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADAN, Paul Dittesgasse 1/7 A-1180 Wien / AT | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94923585.7 | 22.08.1994 | [1996/34] | WO1994AT00117 | Priority number, date | AT19930002199 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: AT 219993 | [1996/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512888 | Date: | 11.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727088 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727088 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/34 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H01H9/346 (EP);
H01H2009/348 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | SCHALTER | [1996/34] | English: | SWITCH | [1996/34] | French: | COMMUTATEUR | [1996/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1185269 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 29 *; | [A]DE1922747 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE1933529 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1* page 4, paragraphs 2-3 *; | [A]EP0183145 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 5 *; | [AD]EP0251160 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * |