EP0669883 - QUICK-CLAMPING HUB FOR BICYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELL, Holger Klarastrasse 18 D-79106 Freiburg / DE | [1995/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Goy, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Zähringer Strasse 373 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94923667.3 | 19.08.1994 | [1995/36] | WO1994DE00961 | Priority number, date | DE19930014583U | 29.09.1993 Original published format: DE 9314583 U | [1995/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509100 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669883 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62H5/00, B62K25/02, F16B41/00 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
B62K25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1995/36] | Title | German: | SCHNELLSPANNABE FÜR FAHRRÄDER | [1995/36] | English: | QUICK-CLAMPING HUB FOR BICYCLES | [1995/36] | French: | MOYEU A SERRAGE RAPIDE POUR BICYCLETTES | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/35] | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9221551 (FELL) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 8; | [YA]FR2671148 (GIMENO) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [A]NL7908505 (LIPS' SLOTENFABRIEKEN B.V.) [A] 1 * page 4, line 2 - line 29; figure - * |